NH HB1349 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 33; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 33; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biological products and diagnostic reagents for animal use.
Title
Relative to biological products and diagnostic reagents for animal use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 33; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 8 |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 7 |