NH HB1410 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Lay HB1410 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 192-170 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Lay HB1410 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 192-170 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain professional licenses and relative to the board of optometry and the regulation of optometry.
Title
Relative to certain professional licenses and relative to the board of optometry and the regulation of optometry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Lay HB1410 on Table (Rep. Nagel): Motion Adopted DV 192-170 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2177s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Pearl Floor Amendment # 2024-2177s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to after HB 1394, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to after HB 1568, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 20A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1849s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1849s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1849s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 18 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2024-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0534h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2024-0534h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0534h 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 5 |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |