NH HB1468 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 137; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 137; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the department of transportation to develop a Conway Branch rail line master plan.
Title
Directing the department of transportation to develop a Conway Branch rail line master plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 137; eff. 07/01/2024 |
2024-06-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 46 |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/26/2024 (Vote 23-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 11 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/05/2024 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 126 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0530h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 126 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0530h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 126 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0530h 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 21 |