NH HB1474 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annual vehicle inspections.
Title
Relative to annual vehicle inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Mike Bordes [R] |
Rep. Tina Harley [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1818s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1818s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1818s, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17A |
2022-03-30 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building201-203 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |