NH HB1475 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expanding the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax to be a reinvestment tax credit.
Title
Relative to expanding the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax to be a reinvestment tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Emily Sandblade [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - Table (Y: 195 N: 68 NV: 55 Abs: 74) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - ITL (Y: 165 N: 95 NV: 58 Abs: 74) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - ITL (Y: 165 N: 95 NV: 58 Abs: 74) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | House | Died on Table |
2014-02-06 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Shurtleff) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-68 |
2014-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Failed Regular Calendar 165-95 (Lacking Constitutional Required 2/3 Present and Voting) |
2014-01-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study |
2014-01-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 5 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |