NH HB1499 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2018; Chapter 269; Eff. 8/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2018; Chapter 269; Eff. 8/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the focus and components of New Hampshire kindergartens.
Title
Relative to the focus and components of New Hampshire kindergartens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2018; Chapter 269; Eff. 8/17/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-1370s; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0606h: Motion Adopted DV 328-8 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 13 |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0606h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 13 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Stone) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0606h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 13 |