NH HB1502 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 16-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 16-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Title
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Roger Berube [D] | Rep. Lenette Peterson [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Interim Study (Y: 188 N: 80 NV: 65 Abs: 54) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 16-1) |
2014-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-07-18 | House | Interim Study-Subcommittee Work Session: 9/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Div.of Vital Records Admin., 71 So. Fruit St., Concord |
2014-06-04 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/10/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-05-21 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/3/2014 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-20 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-80 |
2014-03-12 | House | Special Order (Rep. Chandler) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Notter) |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | =RESCHEDULED= Executive Session: 2/20/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-20 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |