NH HB249 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the award of alimony and the enforcement of orders under RSA 458.
Title
Relative to the award of alimony and the enforcement of orders under RSA 458.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-04-06 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 04/14/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 03/29/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-16 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 03/22/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-10 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 03/15/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-01-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 30 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 3 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-09-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-06-09 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |