NH HB297 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB297
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB297-FN-A 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB297-FN-A 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Title
Making an appropriation to the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB297-FN-A 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; ) |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-08-31 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Finance House Journal 2 P. 42 |
Same As/Similar To
HB297 (Carry Over) 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB297-FN-A 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )