NH HB390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB390
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2540s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2540s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to parties on certain election forms and ballots and relative to the voter registration form used on the day of the general election.
Title
Relative to parties on certain election forms and ballots and relative to the voter registration form used on the day of the general election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2540s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 10 |
2017-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 9 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB390 (Carry Over) 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2540s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar