NH HB449 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB449
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of group II retirement benefits in the retirement system.
Title
Relative to the calculation of group II retirement benefits in the retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB449 (Carry Over) 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308