NH HB541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the compensation of members of the general court.
Title
Relative to the compensation of members of the general court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Table (Y: 286 N: 48 NV: 39 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 286-48 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 69 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Marple) 03/18/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 17 |