NH HB580 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing moratoriums on wind turbine plants and electric transmission line projects.
Title
Establishing moratoriums on wind turbine plants and electric transmission line projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Skip Reilly [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - ITL (Y: 194 N: 148 NV: 19 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-148 |
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-18 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-10-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-10-16 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-09-25 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/25/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Representatives Hall |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.201 |