NH HB587 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0035; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0035; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical examination requirements for commercial drivers' licenses.
Title
Relative to medical examination requirements for commercial drivers' licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Tasker [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Rep. Bruce Hodgdon [R] |
Rep. Romeo Danais [R] | Rep. Maureen Mann [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0035; Effective 7/26/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation |
2014-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2317h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Amendment #2317h Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2317h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-10-15 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-07-23 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.201 |