NH HR9 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming revenue estimates for fiscal years 2017, 2018, and 2019.
Title
Affirming revenue estimates for fiscal years 2017, 2018, and 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced pursuant to Rule 35c 02/16/2017 House Journal 9 P. 6 |