NH SB136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the land use board and requiring approval of federal land acquisitions by the governor and council.
Title
Eliminating the land use board and requiring approval of federal land acquisitions by the governor and council.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Carolyn Matthews [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Rep. Duane Brown [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar