NH SB252 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB252
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Lay SB252 on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Lay SB252 on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial, directing the establishment of an electronic monitoring program for criminal defendants released on bail, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial, directing the establishment of an electronic monitoring program for criminal defendants released on bail, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Mark Proulx [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Lay SB252 on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 101 |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/02/2024 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 17 |
2024-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-27 | House | Division Work Session: 04/01/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-03-21 | House | Division Work Session: 03/27/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/06/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-01-09 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/16/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-01-03 | House | Referred to Finance 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 45 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2470h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 42 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2470h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 43 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2470h (NT) 11/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 8 |
2023-11-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/08/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-10-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/09/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/03/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/02/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/23/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Special Order to 03/09/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2023 Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB252 (Carry Over) 2023-09-14 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37