NH SB318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Vetoed by Governor 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Vetoed by Governor 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Converting the manufactured housing installations standards board and the board of examiners of nursing home administrators into advisory boards, and creating a new advisory board named the advisory board of massage therapists, reflexologists, structural integrators, and Asian bodywork therapists.
Title
Converting the manufactured housing installations standards board and the board of examiners of nursing home administrators into advisory boards, and creating a new advisory board named the advisory board of massage therapists, reflexologists, structural integrators, and Asian bodywork therapists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1780h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 25 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1780h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 25 |
2024-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1780h (NT) 05/08/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 9 |
2024-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1429h: 04/10/2024 03:05 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 P. 138 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |