NH SB321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-12 - Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-12 - Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial.
Title
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-09-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-05-23 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 8 |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/24/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 8 |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 10 P. 227 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0866, 03/07/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 9A |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0866s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0866s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |