NH SB322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6, Pg.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6, Pg.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the holding of gold and silver by municipalities.
Title
Relative to the holding of gold and silver by municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] | Sen. Fenton Groen [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] |
Rep. Robert Malone [R] | Rep. Andrew Manuse [R] | Rep. Donna Mauro [R] | Rep. Gregory Sorg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6, Pg.150 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/7/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Hearing: 2/14/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.11 |