NH SB322 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the renomination of teachers.
Title
Relative to the renomination of teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED === |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Special Order SB 322 to the end of the Commerce Committee, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services; |