NH SB322 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2024; Chapter 0015; Effective 07/13/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2024; Chapter 0015; Effective 07/13/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licenses to carry and immunity for law enforcement officers issuing certain firearms licenses.
Title
Relative to licenses to carry and immunity for law enforcement officers issuing certain firearms licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2024; Chapter 0015; Effective 07/13/2024 |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2024 adopted House Journal 12 P. 44 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/02/2024); Senate Journal 12 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2024-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 6 P. 138 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0542s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0542s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0542s, 02/15/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |