NH SB337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0169; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0169; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emergency medical and trauma services data sharing to the purposes of analysis.
Title
Relative to emergency medical and trauma services data sharing to the purposes of analysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0169; Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-13 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |