NH SB352 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0188
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0188
Summary
Relative to student insurance.
Title
Relative to student insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0188 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2244 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015 Adopted | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015 Adopted; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-05 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1885 | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 5 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1622 | |
2010-04-13 | House Continued Executive Session: 4/22/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-04-13 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-04-07 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/7/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 30, PG.1520 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.255 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1125s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.176 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1125s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.176 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1125s, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Hearing: February 9, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 2, Pg.29 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2854&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |