NH SB364 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a historic housing preservation tax credit.
Title
Relative to establishing a historic housing preservation tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/21/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0172s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0172s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0172s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |