NH SB366 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to use of certain OHRVs on snowmobile trails, and relative to authorization for snowmobiles and OHRVs registered in Vermont and Maine to operate in this state.
Title
Relative to use of certain OHRVs on snowmobile trails, and relative to authorization for snowmobiles and OHRVs registered in Vermont and Maine to operate in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
Rep. Marc Tremblay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off | |
2012-05-25 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 2:00 p.m., Room 100, State House | |
2012-05-24 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Packard, Chandler, Tholl, and Cloutier [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2494 | |
2012-05-24 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2494 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Gallus, Kelly, and Sanborn | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Rausch Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #1480h, #2196h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2196h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2348-2349 | |
2012-05-16 | House Amendment #2196h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2348-2349 | |
2012-05-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2196h; House Calendar 37, PG.2113 | |
2012-05-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2196h for May 15 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2043 | |
2012-05-01 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-05-01 | House Division I Work Session: 5/8/2012 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 | |
2012-04-25 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 38, PG.2151 | |
2012-04-25 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1480h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2151 | |
2012-04-25 | House Amendment #1480h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2151 | |
2012-04-11 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1480h (New Title); House Calendar 33, PG.1959 | |
2012-04-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1480h(NT) for April 25 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1922 | |
2012-04-11 | House Continued Executive Session: 4/11/2012 11:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2012-03-29 | House Executive Session: 4/10/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==Recessed== | |
2012-03-06 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0712s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.135 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Amendment 0712s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.135 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Without Objection Rule 3-7 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0712s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5, Pg.135 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment; Senate Journal 5, Pg.135 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0712s, New Title, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 4, Pg.117 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/2/12, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |