NH SB367 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - II. Remainder Effective 05/31/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - II. Remainder Effective 05/31/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reestablishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders.
Title
Reestablishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 05/31/2024 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 11/01/2025 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2024; Chapter 0036 |
2024-05-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 176 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/22/2024); Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 12 |
2024-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/10/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 9 |
2024-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 P. 138 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |