NH SB389 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to extending trout season for catch and release to December 31.
Title
Relative to extending trout season for catch and release to December 31.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |