NH SB399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0156; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0156; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for blood testing associated with elevated lead levels.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for blood testing associated with elevated lead levels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0156; Effective 09/01/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 7 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0405s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0405s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0405s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |