NH SB402 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for pediatric vision screenings.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for pediatric vision screenings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/13/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |