NH SB406 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services to increase rates for shelter programs.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services to increase rates for shelter programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1866h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 74 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1866h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 74 |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1866h 05/15/2024 (Vote 23-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 19 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/29/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/23/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 103 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1465s, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 14A |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1268s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1268s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1268s, 04/05/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |