NH SB414 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-23 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-23 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
Summary
Relative to the Mount Washington commission.
Title
Relative to the Mount Washington commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Rep. Paul Ingersoll [D] |
Rep. William Remick [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-09-22 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-09-08 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-09-01 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-06-23 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/29/2010 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-05-12 | House Referred to Executive Departments and Administration for Interim Study | |
2010-05-12 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1954 | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for May 12 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Journal 37, PG.1735 | |
2010-04-30 | House Executive Session: 5/4/2010 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-04-29 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/3/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-04-21 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-04-13 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/20/2010 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-04-13 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/15/2010 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.255 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1063s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.208 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1063s, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.208 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1063s, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === March 16, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === March 16, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-01-19 | Senate Hearing; === RECESSED === January 19, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m. | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Hearing; January 19, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2723&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |