NH SB418 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0239; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0239; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to verification of voter affidavits.
Title
Relative to verification of voter affidavits.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Rep. Raymond Howard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 164 N: 155 NV: 24 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 180 N: 154 NV: 19 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 164 N: 155 NV: 24 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 180 N: 154 NV: 19 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0239; Effective 01/01/2023 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1870h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 164-155 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1870h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1870h (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1487h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-154 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 2022-1487h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1487h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 15 |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/08/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Election Law |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1096s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1096s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1096s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1096s, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/20/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |