NH SB456 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 174-186 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 174-186 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state loan repayment program for qualified nursing professionals, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the state loan repayment program for qualified nursing professionals, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 174-186 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 88 |
2024-05-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 86 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed DV 178-182 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 86 |
2024-05-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-05-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 21 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Division III Work Session: 05/10/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Division III Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 58 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 187-177 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 57 |
2024-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 22 |
2024-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 10 P. 227 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0826s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0826s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0826s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |