NH SB517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0105; Effective 05/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0105; Effective 05/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the amount deducted from a fine for each day of a person's incarceration.
Title
Increasing the amount deducted from a fine for each day of a person's incarceration.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0105; Effective 05/19/2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 5 |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 7 |
2016-03-31 | House | Executive Session: 03/31/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/31/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |