NH SB574 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0309; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0309; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of a temporary agent for a minor child or incapacitated person.
Title
Relative to the appointment of a temporary agent for a minor child or incapacitated person.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 352 N: 7 NV: 19 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0309; Effective 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Report 2024-2216c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2024-2216c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2024; Senate Journal 17 |
2024-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2024-2216c Filed 06/06/2024; As Amended by the Senate House Journal 15 |
2024-06-06 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Doucette Replaces Rep. Ball 06/06/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/04/2024, 01:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/03/2024, 11:00 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2024-05-30 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. M. Pearson, Ball, Long, Gibbons 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 29 |
2024-05-30 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 28 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gannon, Abbas, Chandley; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1853h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 352-7 05/09/2024 House Journal 13 P. 64 |
2024-05-09 | House | FLAM # 2024-1853h (NT) (Rep. Post): Amendment Adopted DV 184-173 05/09/2024 House Journal 13 P. 64 |
2024-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. K. Perez, Kuttab, T. Mannion, Ankarberg, Post, Popovici-Muller, Wherry, Spillane, Ball, Cushman) 05/08/2024 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/30/2024 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 10 P. 228 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0984s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0984s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-0984s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |