NH SB592 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the child welfare system.
Title
Relative to the child welfare system.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Rep. Martin Bove [R] |
Rep. Karen Umberger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Section 17 Effective 06/26/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 1 & 18 shall not take effect |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2018; Chapter 0337 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2099e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2099e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1704h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1704h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1704h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 23-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 22 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division III Work Session: 04/24/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 04/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/16/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/06/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1153s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1153s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1153s, 03/22/2018; Senate Calendar 13A |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0992s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0992s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0992s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0992s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/08/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |