NH SB595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0312; Effective 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0312; Effective 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rates for pole attachments.
Title
Relative to the rates for pole attachments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0312; Effective 07/01/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1950h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 40 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1950h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 40 |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1950h 05/14/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 13 |
2024-04-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-24 | House | Full committee Work Session: 04/29/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/29/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/15/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 228 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-0787s, and 2024-1009s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2024-1009s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0787s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0787s, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 3 |