NH SB613 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to crash data.
Title
Relative to access to crash data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0284s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0284s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0284s, 02/06/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |