NH SB646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Medicare supplemental insurance.
Title
Relative to Medicare supplemental insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |