NH SB726 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to programs to aid veterans' access to employment, housing, health care, and college degrees.
Title
Relative to programs to aid veterans' access to employment, housing, health care, and college degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1209s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment # 2020-1209s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2020-1172s; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Special Order to the end of Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Offered Floor Amendment # 2020-1172s; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1042s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1042s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 2 |