NJ A1027 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A724
Note: Carry Foward to future S1265
Note: Carry Over of previous A4732
Note: Carry Foward to future S1265
Note: Carry Over of previous A4732
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes crime of creating false public alarms as form of bias intimidation.
Title
Includes crime of creating false public alarms as form of bias intimidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1027 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1027 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4732 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2568 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1027 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4732 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2568 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee