NJ A1050 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S337
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands financing opportunities for low and moderate income housing.
Title
Expands financing opportunities for low and moderate income housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1050 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2126 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2544 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (25-10)
A2126 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2544 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (25-10)