NJ A1054 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1566
Note: Carry Foward to future S2064
Note: Carry Over of previous A4948
Note: Carry Foward to future S2064
Note: Carry Over of previous A4948
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies certain responsibilities of licensed wineries and retail salesrooms.
Title
Clarifies certain responsibilities of licensed wineries and retail salesrooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1054 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A1054 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A4948 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S658 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1054 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A4948 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S658 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee