NJ A1074 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Approved P.L.2012, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Approved P.L.2012, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Kulesh and Kubert's, and Bolis Law;" establishes violation of hands-free cell phone law as reckless under vehicular homicide and assault by auto statutes.*
Title
"Kulesh and Kubert's, and Bolis Law;" establishes violation of hands-free cell phone law as reckless under vehicular homicide and assault by auto statutes.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1616 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1616 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.22. |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Substituted for S1616 (1R) |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1616 (Same As) 2012-06-28 - Substituted by A1074/2199 (ACS)