NJ A1076 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5640
Note: Carry Over of previous S4014
Note: Carry Over of previous S4014
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Approved P.L.2020, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Approved P.L.2020, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG to collect, record, analyze, and report certain prosecutorial and criminal justice data.
Title
Requires AG to collect, record, analyze, and report certain prosecutorial and criminal justice data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2638 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2638 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.120. |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Kean) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (40-0) (Kean) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2638 |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5640 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2638 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1076 (1R)
S4014 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2638 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1076 (1R)
S4014 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee