NJ A1077 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2838
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous A5857
Note: Carry Over of previous S4314
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous A5857
Note: Carry Over of previous S4314
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S705 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S705 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop and implement plan to improve access to perinatal mood and anxiety disorder screening.
Title
Requires DOH to develop and implement plan to improve access to perinatal mood and anxiety disorder screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S705 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S705 (1R)
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S705 (1R)
A5857 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S705 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.380.
S4314 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S705 (1R)
A5857 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S705 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.380.
S4314 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee