NJ A1086 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A950
Note: Carry Over of previous S2654
Note: Carry Over of previous S2654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits sale of raw milk under certain conditions and establishes raw milk permit program.
Title
Permits sale of raw milk under certain conditions and establishes raw milk permit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A950 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S2654 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3414 (Same As) 2024-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2654 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3414 (Same As) 2024-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1086 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1086_I1.HTM |