NJ A1104 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4856
Note: Carry Over of previous S2979
Note: Carry Over of previous S2979
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.29.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.29.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Hunger-Free Students' Bill of Rights Act"; requires certain school meal information be provided to students' parents; establishes protocols for identifying eligible students for meal programs; prohibits stigmatizing student with bill in arrears.
Title
"Hunger-Free Students' Bill of Rights Act"; requires certain school meal information be provided to students' parents; establishes protocols for identifying eligible students for meal programs; prohibits stigmatizing student with bill in arrears.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S687 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.29. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Substituted for S687 (1R) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4856 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
S687 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A1104 (1R)
S2979 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S687 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A1104 (1R)
S2979 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee