NJ A1129 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A636
Note: Carry Foward to future S1095
Note: Carry Foward to future S126
Note: Carry Over of previous A2012
Note: Carry Over of previous S950
Note: Carry Foward to future S1095
Note: Carry Foward to future S126
Note: Carry Over of previous A2012
Note: Carry Over of previous S950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax credit for certain investment in manufacturing equipment and manufacturing facility renovation, modernization, and expansion, or hiring and training of new employees for manufacturing purposes.
Title
Provides corporation business tax credit for certain investment in manufacturing equipment and manufacturing facility renovation, modernization, and expansion, or hiring and training of new employees for manufacturing purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1129 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1129 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1129 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2012 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1104 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S950 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1129 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1129 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2012 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1104 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S950 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1129_I1.HTM |